MA S2095 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Tina Jennings, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Tina Jennings, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-01-19 | House | Enacted |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-01-19 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-01-14 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-01-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-01-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-01-14 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2016-01-13 | House | House concurred |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-12-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S1951 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action taken
S2087 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1910 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S1977 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - New draft substituted, see S2009
S2514 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1372 (Similar To) 2016-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1336 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied H3285
S1341 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2087 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1910 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
S1977 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - New draft substituted, see S2009
S2514 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1372 (Similar To) 2016-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1336 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied H3285
S1341 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2095 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2095.pdf |