MA S2056 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the cybersecurity of the internet connected devices and autonomous vehicles. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the cybersecurity of the internet connected devices and autonomous vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-28SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-07-20SenateSenate concurred
2020-07-06HouseReporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-06-18SenateSenate concurred
2020-06-01HouseReporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-27HouseHouse concurred
2020-03-23SenateReporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-05HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-06SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-01-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H2991 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3013 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2115 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H2690 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S315 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1822 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback