MA S1822 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2569

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to cybersecurity insurance preference in state contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cybersecurity insurance preference in state contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2569
2019-07-18JointHearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2056 (Similar To) 2020-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1810 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2690 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S315 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1887 (Similar To) 2021-01-04 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2719 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2569 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback