MA H2991 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4772

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to limiting autonomous driving capabilities to zero emission and electric vehicles. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting autonomous driving capabilities to zero emission and electric vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-08HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4772
2020-01-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3013 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2056 (Similar To) 2020-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2115 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H4772 (Replaced by) 2020-06-08 - Reported, in part, by H3014

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback