MA S315 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2538

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to cybersecurity education in schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cybersecurity education in schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2538
2019-07-03JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H477 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2056 (Similar To) 2020-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S771 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H400 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1822 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1839 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
H2690 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H1202 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H3613 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H547 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback