MA S1963 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2743
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to taxes and fee transparency. Revenue.
Title
Relative to taxes and fee transparency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2743 |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1261 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H3169 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2173 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2743 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H1261 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H3169 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4969
S1060 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
S1208 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2721
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2173 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2743 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1963 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1963.pdf |