MA S881 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to full disclosure of fees. Housing.
Title
Relative to full disclosure of fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2585 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S178 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S971 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1816
H2815 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2845 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2199 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S654 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1463 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S877 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S844 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2585 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S178 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S971 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1816
H2815 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2845 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2199 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S654 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1463 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S877 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S844 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S881 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S881.pdf |