MA S1956 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2743
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Commonwealth Municipal Dog Park Trust Fund. Revenue.
Title
Establishing the Commonwealth Municipal Dog Park Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2743 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S2537 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S427 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1490 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2743 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H55 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H89
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
S2537 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H4111 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1105 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S427 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1490 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S2743 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H55 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H89
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1956 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1956.pdf |