MA S1831 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2569
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for an investigation and study by special commission relative to the one-day solemnizer rule. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by special commission relative to the one-day solemnizer rule
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Sen. Dean Tran [R] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] |
Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2569 |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S43 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2723
H3524 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2569 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S43 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2723
H3524 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2569 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1831 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1831.pdf |