MA S1734 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to repeal the sales tax on boats built or rebuilt in the Commonwealth. Revenue.
Title
Repealing the sales tax on boats built or rebuilt in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2596 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2469 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1773 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1776 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2596 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2469 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1773 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1776 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2641 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1734 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1734.pdf |