MA S1773 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to vehicle registration and sales tax. Revenue.
Title
Relative to vehicle registration and sales tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2958 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3113 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1418 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2991 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2958 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3113 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1418 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2991 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1773 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1773.pdf |