MA S2072 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the registration and insurance of motorized scooters in the Commonwealth. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the registration and insurance of motorized scooters in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Bill reported adversely by committee |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-01 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-03-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H558 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1332 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2863
H3084 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3060
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1332 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see S2863
H3084 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3060
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2074 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2133 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2072 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2072.pdf |