MA S1537 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reform the group insurance commission. Public Service.
Title
Reforming the group insurance commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S94 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H380 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
H487 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1152 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S974 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1148 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2193 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H664 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H137 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2220 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
H380 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
H487 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1152 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S974 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1148 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2193 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H664 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H137 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2220 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1537 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1537.pdf |