MA H2193 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4722
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public hearings of the Group Insurance Commission. Public Service.
Title
Relative to public hearings of the Group Insurance Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4722 |
2019-07-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1152 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1522 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S583 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S584 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S560 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1574 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1532 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
S1522 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S583 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S584 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S560 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S1470 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1574 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1532 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4722 (Replaced by) 2020-05-20 - Reported, in part, by H2169
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2193 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2193.pdf |