MA S2220 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to reform the toxic use reduction act. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To reform the toxic use reduction act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-05-13HouseHouse concurred
2019-05-02SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended
2019-04-25SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H664 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H137 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H380 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S94 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H828 (Similar To) 2019-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback