MA S1417 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2565
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to suppressors. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to unlawful suppressors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2565 |
2019-08-22 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 08/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-08-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H3398 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S999 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3567
S1671 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H3311 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1420 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2072 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2089 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1426 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1368 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S828 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2565 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S999 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3567
S1671 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H3311 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1420 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2072 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2089 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S1426 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1368 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S828 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2565 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1417 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1417.pdf |