MA S1671 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2549

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure timely restitution payments to victims of crime. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure timely restitution payments to victims of crime

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2549
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H2598 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
H2442 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S702 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2465 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1725 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2650 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback