MA H2650 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Revenue to collect unpaid amounts of restitution payments to victims of crime by withholding wages of offenders. Revenue.
Title
To ensure timely restitution payments to victims of crime
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1671 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H3473 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1041 (Similar To) 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
S890 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3455
H1383 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3473 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1041 (Similar To) 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
S890 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied H3455
H1383 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5148
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2650 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2650.pdf |