MA S141 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2534

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to licensure of art therapists. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to licensure of art therapists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2534
2019-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H558 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1312 (Similar To) 2020-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2768
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H159 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1002 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1750 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1752 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S353 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1098 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S52 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied S61
S2306 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2362 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4257 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4459
S2448 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2534 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback