MA S1219 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2535
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to direct the Department of Public Health to compile data and issue a report on vision screening for children entering kindergarten. Public Health.
Title
To establish a children’s vision screening registry
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Christine Barber [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
Rep. John Scibak [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Alice Peisch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2535 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S289 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2259
S32 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S1175 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2555
S547 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1273 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2643
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S40 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H796 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2274 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
S289 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2259
S32 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S1175 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2555
S547 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1273 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2643
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S40 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H796 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2274 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4701
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1626 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied S1184
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H1332 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H984 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2535 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Reported (in part) by S1256
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1219 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1219.pdf |