MA S1214 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to create an emergency nursing home task force. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To create an emergency nursing home task force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S791 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
S1141 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H510 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S341 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1912 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1166 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S1832 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S253 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2822 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3851 (Similar To) 2019-07-09 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback