MA H933 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-03 - No further action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-03 - No further action
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Messrs. Rogers of Cambridge and Mark of Peru, a petition of David M. Rogers, Paul W. Mark and others for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to declare rights afforded to the human inhabitants of the Commonwealth are not applicable to corporations, limited liability companies or any other corporate entities. Financial Services.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to declare that corporations are not people, money is not speech
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | Joint | No further action |
2017-01-03 | Joint | Joint session held and dissolved |
2016-07-13 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Tuesday, January 3, 2017 |
2016-05-18 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 13, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, May 18, 2016 |
2016-02-03 | Joint | Placed at the end of the calendar |
2016-02-03 | Joint | Read twice |
2015-05-13 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, October 21, 2015 |
2015-05-11 | House | Called for consideration in the joint session |
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on file |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on file |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass |
2015-04-10 | House | Hearing rescheduled to 04/15/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/15/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-04-06 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2044 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2043 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2042 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
H3071 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1865 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H2043 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2042 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4414
H3071 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1865 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H933 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H933.pdf |