MA H861 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5041
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Blais of Sunderland, a petition of Natalie M. Blais and others that the Department of Agricultural Resources be authorized to establish a circuit rider program to provide on-site guidance to businesses. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Supporting the Commonwealth's farmers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5041 |
2021-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1822 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3409 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1833 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S499 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
H1007 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
S1893 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2995
S198 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H5047 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2022
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
H3060 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3409 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1833 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S499 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
H1007 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
S1893 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2995
S198 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H5047 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2022
H5041 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
H3060 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H861 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H861.pdf |