MA H3060 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a tax deduction for charitable donations of food by certain farmers. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide a tax deduction for charitable donations of food by farmers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-14JointHearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-12-03JointHearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2483 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H1004 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
H2815 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2980 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1408 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2770
S2116 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S503 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Reporting date extended to Friday May 27, 2022, pending concurrence
S499 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S954 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1418 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S2595 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback