MA S499 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to agricultural composting programs. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Regarding agricultural composting programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2021-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H963 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1833 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1893 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2995
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H5047 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2022
H2934 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1833 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1893 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2995
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
S502 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2880
H5047 (Similar To) 2022-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2022
H2934 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S499 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S499.pdf |