MA S503 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Sustainable Food Service Ware Act. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To reduce plastic packaging waste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 27, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 12, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday March 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S525 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2895
H996 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2895 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H996 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2895 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2038 (Similar To) 2021-12-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S503 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S503.pdf |