MA S2895 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S525
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to plastic bag reduction, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2895).
Title
Eliminating plastic bags
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | New draft of S525 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S525 (Replaces) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2895
S1332 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S579 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2896
H902 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4826
S2896 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4826 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1332 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S579 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2896
H902 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4826
S2896 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4826 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2895 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2895.pdf |