MA H4826 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H902
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1-1)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to plastic bag reduction
Title
Relative to plastic bag reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-06-02 | House | New draft of H902 and H992 |
2022-06-02 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H902 (Replaces) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4826
S525 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2895
S1465 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S579 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2896
S2895 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2896 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S525 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2895
S1465 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S579 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2896
S2895 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2896 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4826 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4826.pdf |