MA S2896 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S579
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce single-use plastics from the environment, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2896).
Title
To reduce single-use plastics from the environment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | New draft of S579 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S579 (Replaces) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2896
H869 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4827
H4827 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1465 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S525 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2895
H902 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4826
H4826 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2895 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H869 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4827
H4827 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1465 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S525 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2895
H902 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4826
H4826 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2895 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2896 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2896.pdf |