OK HB3591 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children; documents; codification; effective date.
Title
Children; documents; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] |
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] | Rep. Trish Ranson [D] | Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] |
Rep. John Talley [R] | Rep. Ellyn Hefner [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2024-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Talley, Lepak, Munson, Ranson, Hefner |
2024-03-06 | House | General Order |
2024-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hill, Stark |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |