MA S1893 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2995
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2995
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2995
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote urban agriculture and horticulture. Revenue.
Title
To promote urban agriculture and horticulture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Accompanied H2995 |
2022-01-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1852 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1912 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2979 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2995 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1852 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S1912 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied S1878
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2979 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2995 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1893 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1893.pdf |