MA H2995 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1893
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the assessed value of real estate in agricultural or horticultural use. Revenue.
Title
Promoting urban agriculture and horticulture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-04-07 | House | Accompanied by S1893 |
2022-01-18 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S178 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S971 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1816
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1893 (Replaces) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2995
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S178 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S971 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1816
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1893 (Replaces) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2995
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2995 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2995.pdf |