MA H667 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Hearing: Oct 16 @ 1:00 pm in A-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish citizens' initiative ballot question review commission. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish citizens' initiative review

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08JointHearing scheduled for 10/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H666 (Similar To) 2019-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S407 (Similar To) 2019-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback