MA S407 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow delivery of ballot question petitions to the Secretary of State by registrars and restricting payments per signature. Election Laws.
Title
Allowing delivery of ballot question petitions to the Secretary of State by registrars and restricting payments per signature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2544 |
2019-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H50 (Similar To) 2019-12-06 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
S998 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H231 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4299
H3321 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S698 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S548 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H946 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H955 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H666 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
H50 (Similar To) 2019-12-06 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
S998 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H231 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4299
H3321 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S698 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S548 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H946 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H955 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H666 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
S2544 (Replaced by) 2020-04-13 - Reported (in part) by S416
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S407 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S407.pdf |