MA H4839 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted, on motion of Ms. Garlick of Needham, for a bill with the same title (House No. 4349). June 2, 2022.
Title
Providing for statement of financial interests flexibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2022-06-02 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-06-02 | House | Substituted for H4349 |
Same As/Similar To
H17 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4349
H4349 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4839
S1740 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H61 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
H2784 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H4349 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4839
S1740 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H61 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
H2784 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4839 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4839.pdf |