MA H17 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4349
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Public Employee Retirement Administration Commission (House, No. 9) as relates to providing for statement of financial interests flexibility. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Providing for statement of financial interests flexibility
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4349 |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2784 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H61 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
H10 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H11 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5051
H12 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1740 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H13 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4349 (Replaced by) 2022-06-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4839
H4839 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H61 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
H10 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H11 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5051
H12 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1740 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H13 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4349 (Replaced by) 2022-06-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4839
H4839 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H17 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H17.pdf |