MA H4745 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3775
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licensing accountability and modernization in the Commonwealth
Title
Relative to licensing accountability and modernization in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-05-12 | House | New draft of H3775 |
2022-05-12 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3775 (Replaces) 2022-05-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4745
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S1179 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H1086 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S1179 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H1086 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4745 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4745.pdf |