MA H4204 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Richard Farnham, an employee of Berkshire County Jail and House of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Richard Farnham, an employee of Berkshire County Jail and House of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-12-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-12-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-11-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-11-14 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-09-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2376 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2019
S1541 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2019
H2369 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1541 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2019
H2369 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4204 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4204.pdf |