CA AB2235 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 5 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4.8 (commencing with Section 22190) to Part 3 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: local agencies: wind infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Assembly - AB 2235 Lowenthal Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Assembly - AB 2235 Lowenthal Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 22190 | New Code | See Bill Text |