CA SB42 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5977 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to courts.
Title
Community Assistance, Recovery, and Empowerment (CARE) Court Program: notice to original petitioner.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB42 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB42 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | June 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1076.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 2). |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5977 | Amended Code | Citation Text |