CA AB1836 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3344.1 of the Civil Code, relating to intellectual property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of likeness: digital replica.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1836 BAUER-KAHAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1836 Bauer-Kahan By Ashby (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1836 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2024.
2024-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2024-09-12 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2024-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 8.).
2024-08-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15.)
2024-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2024-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4.).
2024-08-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2024-08-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 15).
2024-08-05SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2024-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2024-05-29SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
2024-05-21SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2024-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 5312.)
2024-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2024-05-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-05-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2024-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2024-04-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-04-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2024-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2024-04-18AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2024-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16).
2024-02-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
2024-01-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
2024-01-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code3344.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1836
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1836#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1836#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1836#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1836#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1836#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1836#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1836#93ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1836#92CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB1836

Bill Comments

feedback