MA H4200 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate hunting on certain property owned by the Department of Correction in the town of Concord. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
To prohibit hunting on property owned by the Department of Correction and located at 28A Union turnpike in the town of Concord
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2024-02-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-02-05 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-01-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-11-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-11-22 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
2023-11-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2037 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H664 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2729 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
H2730 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
H2038 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H664 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2729 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
H2730 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
H2038 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4200 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4200.pdf |