MA H4115 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Boston be authorized to further regulate the zoning of housing, commercial and institutional development in said city. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Boston to limit buildings according to their use or construction to specified districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-07 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Enacted |
2021-01-06 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading discharge report accepted |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Read third |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-12-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-12-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2019 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-10-24 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-10-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H864 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H863 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H2767 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H863 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H2767 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4115 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4115.pdf |