MA H4093 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-21 - Adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Michlewitz of Boston, a petition of [PETITIONERS LIST] [BACKING TEXT]. Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently.
Title
Joint Committee on Financial Services Extended Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Adopted, in concurrence |
2016-03-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Adopted, as amended |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Motion to reconsider prevailed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Adopted, in concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee reported ought to be adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H3048 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2615 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3321 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2159 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H4736 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2016
H2615 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3321 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2159 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H4736 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4093 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4093.pdf |