MA H4736 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Dek Lee, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Dek Lee, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-01-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-12-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-12-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-11-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-11-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-11-17 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-11-10 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3048 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2615 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3321 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2159 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H443 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H2615 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3321 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2159 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H443 (Similar To) 2016-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4736 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4736.pdf |