MA H3908 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Lawrence be authorized to establish a program for enforcement against illegal bars and illegal casinos. The Judiciary. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Lawrence to establish a program for enforcement against illegal bars and illegal casinos
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-07-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3910 (Similar To) 2021-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 109 of the Acts of 2021
H1805 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3949 (Similar To) 2022-01-06 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4319
H4319 (Similar To) 2022-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 271 of the Acts of 2022
H5316 (Similar To) 2022-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5371
H1805 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H3949 (Similar To) 2022-01-06 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4319
H4319 (Similar To) 2022-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 271 of the Acts of 2022
H5316 (Similar To) 2022-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5371
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3908 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3908.pdf |