MA H1805 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the appointment of additional assistant clerks in the district court of Lawrence. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the District Court of Lawrence
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4844 |
2021-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1624 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1039 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1933
H3910 (Similar To) 2021-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 109 of the Acts of 2021
H3908 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3949 (Similar To) 2022-01-06 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4319
H1780 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4319 (Similar To) 2022-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 271 of the Acts of 2022
H5316 (Similar To) 2022-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5371
S1039 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Accompanied H1933
H3910 (Similar To) 2021-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 109 of the Acts of 2021
H3908 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3949 (Similar To) 2022-01-06 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4319
H1780 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4319 (Similar To) 2022-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 271 of the Acts of 2022
H5316 (Similar To) 2022-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5371
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1805 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1805.pdf |