MA H3889 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5031
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Connolly of Cambridge, a petition of Mike Connolly and others that cities and towns be authorized to establish an excise tax on vacant units in large residential buildings. Revenue.
Title
Enabling a local option for a tax on vacant units in large residential buildings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5031 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H2622 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1763 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
H4283 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2020
H5031 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
H2622 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1763 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H4243 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2020
H4283 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2020
H5031 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3889 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3889.pdf |