MA H3791 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of roommate houses as sober homes or halfway houses. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to halfway houses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5225 |
2021-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H353 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H160 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H1315 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1282 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2393 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1383 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H353 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H160 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5022
H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
H1315 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1282 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
S873 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2393 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H609 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1383 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3791 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3791.pdf |