MA H3638 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reimbursement for life insurance for members of the Massachusetts National Guard. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to life insurance for members of the Massachusetts National Guard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2022 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2518 (Similar To) 2022-09-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 226 of the Acts of 2022
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S1375 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H3286 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1221 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S1375 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H3286 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3638 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3638.pdf |